Global Patent Index - EP 1086091 A1

EP 1086091 A1 2001-03-28 - HIV INTEGRASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

HIV INTEGRASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

HIV-INTEGRASE-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE VIH INTEGRASE

Publication

EP 1086091 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926095 A

Priority

  • GB 9814925 A
  • US 9912094 W
  • US 8784698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962897A1] Sulfur-containing heteroaryl dioxo-butyric acid derivatives are described as inhibitors of HIV integrase and inhibitors of HIV replication. These compounds are useful in the prevention or treatment of infection by HIV and the treatment of AIDS, either as compounds, pharmaceutically acceptable salts, pharmaceutical composition ingredients, whether or not in combination with other antivirals, immunomodulators, antibiotics or vaccines. Methods of treating AIDS and methods of preventing or treating infection by HIV are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 333/74; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/425; C07D 277/04; C07D 277/18; C07D 333/22; C07D 333/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4436 (2006.01); A61K 31/4535 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 277/20 (2006.01); C07D 277/34 (2006.01); C07D 277/36 (2006.01); C07D 277/38 (2006.01); C07D 277/42 (2006.01); C07D 333/24 (2006.01); C07D 333/28 (2006.01); C07D 333/32 (2006.01); C07D 333/34 (2006.01); C07D 333/36 (2006.01); C07D 333/56 (2006.01); C07D 333/60 (2006.01); C07D 333/74 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 277/42 (2013.01); C07D 333/24 (2013.01); C07D 333/32 (2013.01); C07D 333/34 (2013.01); C07D 333/36 (2013.01); C07D 333/60 (2013.01); C07D 333/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962897 A1 19991209; AU 4225599 A 19991220; AU 757409 B2 20030220; CA 2333771 A1 19991209; EP 1086091 A1 20010328; EP 1086091 A4 20011010; JP 2002517390 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040427

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030121

2001-10-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 333/74 A, 7C 07D 333/56 B, 7C 07D 333/22 B, 7C 07D 277/04 B, 7C 07D 277/18 B, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/425 B, 7C 07D 333/24 B, 7C 07D 333/32 B, 7C 07D 333/34 B, 7C 07D 333/36 B, 7C 07D 333/38 B, 7C 07D 409/12 B, 7C 07D 409/06 B, 7C 07D 277/56 B, 7C 07D 333/68 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20010103;LT PAYMENT 20010103;LV PAYMENT 20010103;MK PAYMENT 20010103;RO PAYMENT 20010103;SI PAYMENT 20010103