Global Patent Index - EP 1086109 A1

EP 1086109 A1 2001-03-28 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CRYSTALLINE SALTS OF AMOXYCILLIN

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PREPARING CRYSTALLINE SALTS OF AMOXYCILLIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG KRISTALLINER AMOXYCILLINSALZE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SELS CRISTALLINS D'AMOXYCILLINE

Publication

EP 1086109 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99955267 A

Priority

  • US 9911991 W
  • US 8755498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962910A1] A novel process for preparing a crystalline alkali metal salt of amoxycillin is dislcosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 499/04; C07D 499/16; C07D 499/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/43 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07D 499/00 (2006.01); C07D 499/04 (2006.01); C07D 499/16 (2006.01); C07D 499/18 (2006.01); C07D 499/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 499/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962910 A1 19991209; AU 4321699 A 19991220; AU 760934 B2 20030522; BR 9910804 A 20010213; CA 2333943 A1 19991209; CN 1182138 C 20041229; CN 1304412 A 20010718; EP 1086109 A1 20010328; EP 1086109 A4 20011219; HU 0102008 A2 20011228; HU 0102008 A3 20020729; IL 139736 A 20040219; IL 139736 D0 20020210; JP 2002517398 A 20020618; NO 20006073 A 20001130; NO 20006073 D0 20001130; NZ 508179 A 20021025; PL 344348 A1 20011105; TR 200003517 T2 20010621; ZA 200006946 B 20020128

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035722

2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020227

2001-12-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001128