Global Patent Index - EP 1086116 A1

EP 1086116 A1 2001-03-28 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE PULMONARY DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACIDS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE PULMONARY DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACIDS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN PULMONATIVEN TRANSPORT VON NUKLEIN-SÄUREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DESTINEES A L'ADMINISTRATION PULMONAIRE D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET PROCEDES

Publication

EP 1086116 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99923263 A

Priority

  • US 9911214 W
  • US 8358598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960010A1] The present invention relates to compositions and methods for the pulmonary delivery of nucleic acids, particularly oligonucleotides. In one preferred embodiment, the compositions and methods of the invention are utilized to effect the pulmonary delivery of an antisense oligonucleotide to an animal in order to modulate the expression of a gene in the animal for investigative, therapeutic or prophylactic purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1135 (2013.01); A61K 9/0073 (2013.01); C12N 15/1137 (2013.01); C12N 15/1138 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01); C12N 2310/321 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3341 (2013.01); C12N 2310/346 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3525

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960010 A1 19991125; AU 4007899 A 19991206; EP 1086116 A1 20010328; EP 1086116 A4 20040317

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-03-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE