Global Patent Index - EP 1086141 A1

EP 1086141 A1 2001-03-28 - ALOE PECTINS

Title (en)

ALOE PECTINS

Title (de)

PEKTINE AUS ALOE

Title (fr)

PECTINES D'ALOES

Publication

EP 1086141 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921889 A

Priority

  • US 9910335 W
  • US 7820498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5929051A] Pectins from gel and rind cell wall fibers of Aloe vera are extracted, isolated and identified. Two classes of Aloe pectin are obtained: the high-molecular-weight (HMW) pectin and the low-molecular-weight (LMW) pectin. Aloe pectins have a low methoxyl (LM) content. Aloe pectins form gel in the presence of calcium, and they, especially, the HMW pectin, form monovalent cation-based gels at low temperature, which revert back to solution when brought to room temperature. The HMW Aloe pectin-calcium gel is used for controlled release. The monovalent cation-based gel is used as a matrix for storing pharmacological substances and also for antigen and antibody precipitation reaction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08B 37/06; A61K 47/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 36/886 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); C08B 37/00 (2006.01); C08B 37/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08B 37/0003 (2013.01); A61K 47/36 (2013.01); C08B 37/0045 (2013.01); C08B 37/0048 (2013.01); C08J 3/075 (2013.01); C08L 5/06 (2013.01); C12P 19/04 (2013.01); C08J 2305/06 (2013.01); Y10S 514/944 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958575A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5929051 A 19990727; AU 3898999 A 19991129; CA 2331744 A1 19991118; CA 2331744 C 20101005; DE 69927498 D1 20060209; DE 69927498 T2 20060713; EP 1086141 A1 20010328; EP 1086141 B1 20050928; EP 1607407 A2 20051221; EP 1607407 A3 20060524; JP 2002514663 A 20020521; WO 9958575 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120512

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69927498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120512

2012-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: NANOTHERAPEUTICS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120531

2011-11-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NANOTHERAPEUTICS, INC. (N.D.GES.D.STATES DELAW, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69927498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110913

2011-11-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69927498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

- Effective date: 20110913

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110505

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69927498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGRI BE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20101122

2011-02-04 [REG FR IC] DECISION OF THE DIRECTOR GENERAL TO DECLARE IRRECEIVABLE OR TO REJECT AN APPEAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: IC

2010-11-30 [BERR] BE: REESTABLISHED

- Owner name: NANOTHERAPEUTICS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERR

- Effective date: 20101122

2010-11-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20100824

2010-08-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: NANOTHERAPEUTICS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-07-23 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2010-07-09 [REG FR D5] RENUNCIATION DUE TO AN APPEAL ON RESTAURATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: D5

2010-07-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2010-07-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090512

2010-05-26 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S28

- Free Format Text: RESTORATION ALLOWED

- Effective date: 20100505

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-16 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2010-04-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100318 AND 20100324

2010-03-31 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S28

- Free Format Text: APPLICATION FILED

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090512

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CARRINGTON LABORATORIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080606

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69927498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-09-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE