Global Patent Index - EP 1086146 A1

EP 1086146 A1 2001-03-28 - CATALYST SYSTEM

Title (en)

CATALYST SYSTEM

Title (de)

KATALYSATORSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CATALYSEUR

Publication

EP 1086146 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99925004 A

Priority

  • DE 19823168 A
  • EP 9903415 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823168A1] Catalyst system contains: (a) metallocene(s); (b) Lewis base(s) comprising (organyl)hydrides of main group V elements; (c) a support; (d) organoboron-aluminum compound(s), bound covalently to the support; and optionally (e) an organometallic compound of a main group I, II or III element. Catalyst system contains: (A) metallocene(s); (B) Lewis base(s) comprising (organyl)hydrides of main group V elements of formula (I); (C) a support; (D) organoboron-aluminum compound(s) of formula (II), bound covalently to the support; and optionally (E) an organometallic compound of a main group I, II or III element of formula (III): R<3>, R<4>, R<5> = hydrogen (H), 1-20 carbon (C) (halo)alkyl, 6-40 C (halo)aryl, 7-40 C alkylaryl or 7-40 C arylalkyl and 2 or all 3 of R<2>, R<3> and R<4> may be combined to a 2-20 C unit; M<2> = a main group V element; R<1>, R<2> = H, halogen, 1-40 C organyl, especially 1-20 C (halo)alkyl, 1-10 C alkoxy, 6-20 C (halo)aryl, 6-20 C aryloxy, 7-40 C (halo)arylalkyl, 7-40 C (halo)alkylaryl; or R<1> = -OSIR3; R = as R<1>; M<3> = a main group III element; i, j = 0, 1 or 2; M<4> = a main group I, II or III element; R<6> = H, halogen or 1-40 C organyl, especially 1-20 C alkyl, 6-40 C aryl, 7-40 C arylalkyl or 7-40 C alkylaryl; p = 1-3; k = 1-4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 4/607; C08F 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 4/605 (2006.01); C08F 4/607 (2006.01); C08F 4/6192 (2006.01); C08F 4/642 (2006.01); C08F 4/646 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 10/06 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01); C08F 4/6592 (2006.01); C08F 110/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 10/06 (2013.01); C08F 4/65916 (2013.01); C08F 4/65927 (2013.01); C08F 110/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/06 + C08F 4/65908
  2. C08F 10/06 + C08F 4/65912

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961488A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823168 A1 19991125; BR 9910675 A 20010130; EP 1086146 A1 20010328; JP 2002516359 A 20020604; WO 9961488 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL