Global Patent Index - EP 1086202 A1

EP 1086202 A1 2001-03-28 - PRODUCTION OF GRANULATES CONTAINING ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDE

Title (en)

PRODUCTION OF GRANULATES CONTAINING ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDE

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSID-HALTIGER GRANULATE

Title (fr)

FABRICATION DE GRANULES CONTENANT DE L'ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDE

Publication

EP 1086202 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955285 A

Priority

  • DE 19824742 A
  • EP 9903565 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824742A1] The invention relates to granulates containing alkylpolyglycoside (APG) having advantageous technical application properties and which can be obtained through a method whereby an aqueous APG paste is mixed with other aqueous non-surface active granulation components and sprayed on a solid mixture being agitated in a mixer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; C11D 1/66; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 11/0088 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963044A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824742 A1 19991209; AT 222288 T 20020815; EP 1086202 A1 20010328; EP 1086202 B1 20020814; ES 2180333 T3 20030201; JP 2002517558 A 20020618; WO 9963044 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150525

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-07-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180333 T3

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902356 20020919

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222288 T 20020815

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL