Global Patent Index - EP 1086234 A1

EP 1086234 A1 2001-03-28 - NEW HUMAN CARBOXYPEPTIDASE INHIBITOR

Title (en)

NEW HUMAN CARBOXYPEPTIDASE INHIBITOR

Title (de)

NEUE MENSCHLICHE CARBOXYPEPTIDASE INHIBITOR

Title (fr)

NOUVEL INHIBITEUR DE CARBOXYPEPTIDASE D'ORIGINE HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1086234 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926512 A

Priority

US 9812020 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2293694A1] The invention provides a human carboxypeptidase inhibitor (CARIN) and polynucleotides which identify and encode CARIN. The invention also provides expression vectors, host cells, agonists, antibodies and antagonists. The invention also provides methods for treating disorders associated with expression of CARIN.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/57; C07K 14/81; C07K 16/38; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/81 (2006.01); C07K 16/38 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/57 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

AU 7833298 A 19991230; CA 2293694 A1 19991216; EP 1086234 A1 20010328; JP 2002511771 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050712

2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030319

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL