Global Patent Index - EP 1086252 A1

EP 1086252 A1 2001-03-28 - HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS ORIGIN BINDING PROTEIN N-TERMINAL TRUNCATION (OBP-NT)

Title (en)

HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS ORIGIN BINDING PROTEIN N-TERMINAL TRUNCATION (OBP-NT)

Title (de)

N-TERMINALE SPALTPRODUK DES HERKUNFT-BINDENDEN PROTEINS (OBP-NT) DES HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS

Title (fr)

TRONCATION DE RESIDU DE N-TERMINAL DE PROTEINE DE LIAISON SE FIXANT SUR L'ORIGINE DU VIRUS DE L'HERPES SIMPLEX

Publication

EP 1086252 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927441 A

Priority

  • US 9913140 W
  • US 8877098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964633A1] The invention provides herpes virus OBP-NT polypeptides and polynucleotides encoding OBP-NT polypeptides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques. Also provided are methods for utilizing OBP-NT polypeptides to screen for antiviral compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/70; C07K 1/00; C07K 14/47; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/22 (2006.01); C07K 14/035 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964633 A1 19991216; CA 2330230 A1 19991216; EP 1086252 A1 20010328; EP 1086252 A4 20050126; JP 2002517261 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050910

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-01-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/70 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/00 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL