Global Patent Index - EP 1086254 A1

EP 1086254 A1 2001-03-28 - METHOD FOR INTEGRATED DESULFURIZING OF PIG IRON MELT AND STEEL MELT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INTEGRATED DESULFURIZING OF PIG IRON MELT AND STEEL MELT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM INTEGRIERTEN ENTSCHWEFELN VON ROHEISEN- UND STAHLSCHMELZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA DESULFURATION INTEGREE DE BAINS DE FONTE ET D'ACIER

Publication

EP 1086254 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908667 A

Priority

  • AT 9900069 W
  • AT 87598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960173A1] The invention relates to a method for producing steel in which iron melt (4) comprising a strong basic slag is desulfurized in a desulfurization vessel (7) by heating the desulfurization slag (8) up to a temperature of 1400-1800 DEG C. The iron melt containing sulfur is desulfurized using this desulfurization slag (8) and is either poured off free of slag in a discontinuous or continuous manner below the desulfurization slag (8). The ratio of iron melt (4) to desulfurization slag (8) does not exceed the value of 10:1 parts by weight, and the desulfurization slag (8) is continuously and/or discontinuously regenerated. Afterwards, a steel melt (21) is produced from the iron melt (4). The aim of the invention is to simplify a successive ladle treatment of the crude steel (11) produced from the desulfurized pig iron (4), especially for minimizing energy and avoiding the production of waste. To this end, the invention provides that a partial quantity of desulfurization slag (8) is fed from the desulfurization vessel (7) into a steel pouring ladle (19) of the desulfurized iron melt (4) to be transformed into a crude steel melt (11). In addition, said partial quantity is recirculated after the ladle treatment and after pouring off the steel melt (21) which is formed in such a manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/064; C21C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/02 (2006.01); C21C 7/064 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/02 (2013.01); C21C 7/064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960173 A1 19991125; AT 407260 B 20010226; AT A87598 A 20000615; CA 2332909 A1 19991125; DE 59900753 D1 20020228; EP 1086254 A1 20010328; EP 1086254 B1 20020109; JP 2002515545 A 20020528; US 6506225 B1 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100318

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-04-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900753 20020228

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE