Global Patent Index - EP 1086262 A1

EP 1086262 A1 2001-03-28 - ELECTROPLATING BATHS

Title (en)

ELECTROPLATING BATHS

Title (de)

BAD FÜR DIE ELEKTROBESCHICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BAIN GALVANOPLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1086262 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00915016 A

Priority

  • US 0007362 W
  • US 27280099 A
  • US 27255199 A
  • US 27311999 A
  • US 27255099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056952A1] The use of alkali metal, alkaline earth metal, ammonium and substituted ammonium salts of alkyl and alkanol sulfonic acids as additives in various types of electroplating baths (e.g., sulfate, sulfonic acid, fluoroborate, and halide baths) has a number of unexpected benefits including wider useful current density range, improved appearance and in the case of tin improved oxidative stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/04; C25D 3/12; C25D 3/20; C25D 3/22; C25D 3/26; C25D 3/30; C25D 3/34; C25D 3/38; C25D 3/50; C25D 3/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/02 (2006.01); C25D 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/32 (2013.01); C25D 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056952 A1 20000928; AU 3632100 A 20001009; AU 773971 B2 20040610; EP 1086262 A1 20010328; EP 1086262 A4 20020102; JP 2002540291 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121113

2009-10-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036087

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071011

2002-01-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011108

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 25D 3/04 A, 7C 25D 3/12 B, 7C 25D 3/20 B, 7C 25D 3/22 B, 7C 25D 3/26 B, 7C 25D 3/30 B, 7C 25D 3/34 B, 7C 25D 3/38 B, 7C 25D 3/50 B, 7C 25D 3/56 B, 7C 25D 3/02 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE