Global Patent Index - EP 1086264 A1

EP 1086264 A1 2001-03-28 - ADJUSTING DRAWFRAME

Title (en)

ADJUSTING DRAWFRAME

Title (de)

REGULIERSTRECKWERK

Title (fr)

BANC D'ETIRAGE DE REGULATION

Publication

EP 1086264 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924633 A

Priority

  • CH 9900255 W
  • CH 127798 A
  • CH 250798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966113A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling drawing of a fibre batch (F) (e.g. a fibre band) in a textile machine (1, 50). Means (222) are used to detect variations of the fibre batch (F) fed as far as a drawframe unit (1). Said unit comprises at least one variable drawing section (HV) which offsets mass variations, and a delay section takes into account the travel time of the fibre batch from the measuring means (222) to an adjustment point (R). The position of the adjustment point (R) and the value of other adjustment parameters have been found to change, along with the delivery speed (LG) or the fibre mass. This results in a loss of quality in terms of uniformity of the fibre band (F1) thus produced. Consequently, the invention relates to a method for modifying a number of parameters of the delivery speed (LG) of the fibre batch (F) and/or comparing the measured course of the fibre good (F1) produced by the drawframe unit with a predetermined theoretical course.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966113A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966113 A1 19991223; AU 4127999 A 20000105; DE 59903261 D1 20021205; EP 1086264 A1 20010328; EP 1086264 B1 20021030; ES 2187162 T3 20030516; US 6499194 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080611

2009-07-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20090221

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060612

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2005-06-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2187162

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903261

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI