Global Patent Index - EP 1086266 A1

EP 1086266 A1 2001-03-28 - DEVICE FOR SECURING A WEAVING REED TO A BATTEN

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SECURING A WEAVING REED TO A BATTEN

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES WEBBLATTES AN EINEM LADENBALKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR FIXER UN PEIGNE SUR UN BATTANT

Publication

EP 1086266 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926450 A

Priority

  • BE 9800448 A
  • EP 9903686 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964653A1] An oblong connecting strip (14) is provided to secure a weaving reed (1) to the batten 12) of a mechanical loom. The connecting strip runs in a substantially longitudinal direction (A) of said weaving reed (1) and is connected to the upper profiled section (4) of the weaving reed (1) in addition to being connected to the batten (12) at a distance from the weaving reed (1) in order to reduce the movement of the weaving reed (1) in a longitudinal direction (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/62; D03D 49/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/60 (2006.01); D03D 49/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/60 (2013.01); D03D 49/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964653A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964653 A1 19991216; BE 1012033 A3 20000404; CN 1117187 C 20030806; CN 1305545 A 20010725; CN 1306089 C 20070321; CN 1515716 A 20040728; DE 59904965 D1 20030515; EP 1086266 A1 20010328; EP 1086266 B1 20030409; JP 2002517632 A 20020618; JP 4511727 B2 20100728; KR 100539017 B1 20051226; US 2002043291 A1 20020418; US 6318412 B1 20011120; US 6516834 B2 20030211

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PICANOL, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PICANOL N.V., IEPER, BE

- Document: DE 59904965

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904965

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904965

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110528

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110528

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free text: PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE)

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SECURING A WEAVING REED TO A BATTEN AND CORRESPONDING REED

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI