Global Patent Index - EP 1086281 A1

EP 1086281 A1 2001-03-28 - DEVICE FOR STIFFENING LARGE-SURFACE CONCRETE ELEMENTS, ESPECIALLY FLOORS AND CEILINGS OF MULTISTORY BUILDINGS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STIFFENING LARGE-SURFACE CONCRETE ELEMENTS, ESPECIALLY FLOORS AND CEILINGS OF MULTISTORY BUILDINGS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSTEIFUNG VON GROSSFLÄCHIGEN BETONELEMENTEN, INSBESONDERE VON BÖDEN UND DECKEN VON MEHRGESCHOSSIGEN GEBÄUDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA RIGIDIFICATION D'ELEMENTS EN BETON DE GRANDE SUPERFICIE, EN PARTICULIER DE SOLS ET DE PLAFONDS DE BATIMENTS A PLUSIEURS ETAGES

Publication

EP 1086281 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927935 A

Priority

  • DE 19825956 A
  • EP 9903982 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964696A1] The invention relates to a hollow body (1) for displacing concrete in concrete buildings. According to the invention, parts (9, 10) of the hollow body are assembled with one another to form the hollow body. Said parts are connected using material, force and/or shaping, or the hollow body is formed by injecting gas from a preform or is formed by an inflatable element, especially a rubber bellow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/38; E04B 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2006.01); E04B 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/38 (2013.01); E04B 5/328 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964693A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964696 A1 19991216; AU 4510599 A 19991230; AU 4607199 A 19991230; DE 19981047 D2 20010913; DE 59912529 D1 20051013; EP 1086281 A1 20010328; EP 1086281 B1 20050907; WO 9964693 A1 19991216; WO 9964693 A9 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912529

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER SCHOELLER B.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130630

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-04 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER SCHOELLER BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGSGESELLS

2010-01-04 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SCHOELLER INDUSTRIES GMBH & CO. KG

2009-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER SCHOELLER BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGSGESELL

- Free text: SCHOELLER INDUSTRIES GMBH#ZUGSPITZSTRASSE 15#82049 PULLACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GEBRUEDER SCHOELLER BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#ZUGSPITZSTRASSE 15#82049 PULLACH (DE)

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912529 P 20051013

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI NL

2005-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOELLER INDUSTRIES GMBH

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI NL