Global Patent Index - EP 1086288 A1

EP 1086288 A1 2001-03-28 - FITTING FOR HOLDING SAFETY GLASS PANES

Title (en)

FITTING FOR HOLDING SAFETY GLASS PANES

Title (de)

BESCHLAG ZUR HALTERUNG VON SICHERHEITSGLASSCHEIBEN

Title (fr)

ARMATURE DE MAINTIEN DE VITRES DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1086288 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920659 A

Priority

  • DE 19915478 A
  • EP 0003000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060206A2] The invention relates to a fitting for holding safety glass panes (2, 3, 21). A hidden safety fitting for preventing said panes from falling out is provided in the form of a film between the individual glass panes (2, 3, 21). Said film is configured as a dividing or connecting film and is connected to the fittings with a positive and nonpositive fit. The inventive fitting also performs a fixing function through permanently elastic elements (6, 8) which ensure stress-free mounting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 17/10 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 17/10293 (2013.01); E06B 3/5436 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0060206A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060206 A2 20001012; WO 0060206 A3 20010111; AU 4115500 A 20001023; CA 2332785 A1 20001012; DE 19915478 A1 20001026; DE 19915478 C2 20010315; EP 1086288 A1 20010328; FI 20002243 A 20001011; HU 0101412 A2 20010928; HU 0101412 A3 20040301; IL 140115 D0 20020210; PL 345843 A1 20020114; US 2001023562 A1 20010927

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040115

2001-07-11 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 3/54 A, 7B 32B 17/10 B

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE