Global Patent Index - EP 1086300 A1

EP 1086300 A1 2001-03-28 - CYLINDER HEAD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

CYLINDER HEAD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

ZYLINDERKOPF FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CULASSE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1086300 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919247 A

Priority

  • DE 19826286 A
  • EP 9902576 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826286A1] The invention relates to a cylinder head for internal combustion engines, comprising one or more passages for mounting camshafts and bearing axles for rocker arms which preferably also actuate a pump-nozzle unit. The cylinder head has the following structure: at least one camshaft is mounted in the cylinder head in divided bearings having screwed on bearing bridges; next to and above the camshaft bearings seats are arranged at the level of the bearing bridges for bearing axles of rocker arms driven by the adjacent camshafts; the bearing axles are held tightly against the bearing bridge by means of screws projecting through them. The aim of the invention is to provide a way of deflecting the tensile forces from the cylinder head which occur at the level of the bearing axle of the rocker arms and are transmitted by their fixing screws. This is achieved by the following characteristics: next to the camshaft bearing (3) a tightening screw (5) with a longer cylindrical head (6) is arranged which is supported by the cylinder head (1) and extends as far as the cylinder block and engages same; the longer cylindrical head (6) has an internal profile (7) and, behind it, an inner thread (8) which is adjusted to the core cross-section of the internal profile (7); the screws (9) projecting through the bearing axles (4) are screwed into the inner thread (8) of the head (6) of the tightening screws (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/053; F02F 1/38; F02M 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/04 (2006.01); F01L 1/053 (2006.01); F02F 1/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F16B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 57/023 (2013.01); F01L 1/0532 (2013.01); F02F 1/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966176A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826286 A1 19991216; CN 1088146 C 20020724; CN 1304476 A 20010718; EP 1086300 A1 20010328; EP 1086300 B1 20011128; JP 2002518623 A 20020625; WO 9966176 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170430

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-03-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59900479

- Effective date: 20120121

2012-01-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59900479

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2004-04-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900479 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT