Global Patent Index - EP 1086301 A1

EP 1086301 A1 2001-03-28 - MOTOR VEHICLE ENGINE UNIT OIL TANK

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE ENGINE UNIT OIL TANK

Title (de)

ÖLBEHÄLTER FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE EINES KRAFTFARHZEUGES

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR D'HUILE POUR LE GROUPE MOTEUR D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1086301 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99922236 A

Priority

  • FR 9901256 W
  • FR 9807172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779478A1] The invention concerns a lubricating oil tank for an engine unit (1) arranged in a motor vehicle engine compartment, open from below, comprising a flat-shaped tank (6) arranged in said compartment (4) lower part, beneath said engine unit, and connected to said engine unit by an oil outlet conduit (11) and by an oil inlet conduit (13) connected to said engine unit oil pump (12). Said tank (6) comprises a part connected to said oil outlet conduit and a lower part connected to said oil inlet conduit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00; F02B 77/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/00 (2006.01); F02B 77/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/0004 (2013.01); F02B 77/13 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964730A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779478 A1 19991210; FR 2779478 B1 20001215; DE 69904721 D1 20030206; DE 69904721 T2 20031023; EP 1086301 A1 20010328; EP 1086301 B1 20030102; ES 2187157 T3 20030516; US 6488002 B1 20021203; WO 9964730 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090528

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187157 T3

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904721 P 20030206

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT V.I.

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT