Global Patent Index - EP 1086339 A1

EP 1086339 A1 2001-03-28 - FOSSIL FUEL FIRED STEAM GENERATOR

Title (en)

FOSSIL FUEL FIRED STEAM GENERATOR

Title (de)

FOSSILBEHEIZTER DAMPFERZEUGER

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR CHAUFFE PAR DES COMBUSTIBLES FOSSILES

Publication

EP 1086339 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936322 A

Priority

  • DE 9901550 W
  • DE 19825800 A
  • DE 19851809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964787A1] The invention relates to a steam generator (2) comprising a combustion chamber (4) for fossil fuel (B). On the heating gas side a vertical gas extractor (8) is mounted downstream of the steam generator via a horizontal gas extractor (6). The aim of the invention is to provide a steam generator which is especially easy to produce and assemble. To this end the combustion chamber (4) comprises a number of burners (30) which are arranged at the level of the horizontal gas extractor (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 21/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 11/12 (2006.01); F22B 21/04 (2006.01); F22B 21/34 (2006.01); F22B 29/06 (2006.01); F22B 31/00 (2006.01); F23C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 21/346 (2013.01); Y10S 122/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964787A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964787 A1 19991216; CA 2334699 A1 19991216; CA 2334699 C 20081118; CN 1192185 C 20050309; CN 1309754 A 20010822; DK 1086339 T3 20020415; EP 1086339 A1 20010328; EP 1086339 B1 20011212; ES 2170588 T3 20020801; JP 2002517706 A 20020618; JP 4242564 B2 20090325; RU 2208739 C2 20030720; US 2002157618 A1 20021031; US 6557499 B2 20030506

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120604

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030527

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-05-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170588 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-05-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020515

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900551 20020124

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE