Global patent index - EP 1086440 A1

EP 1086440 A1 2001-03-28 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC SHAPE CHARACTERIZATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC SHAPE CHARACTERIZATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN FORMKARAKTERISIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CARACTERISATION DE FORMES AUTOMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1086440 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927302 A

Priority

  • US 9912698 W
  • US 8836798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964983A1] A method and apparatus for classifying population states based on shape characterizations of sub-manifolds of points, curves, surfaces, or sub-volumes. A structure is examined using, for example, clinical imaging techniques such as CT, MRI, or Ultrasound (601). The image is then subjected to a transform function to generate a map (602) of the new image. The new image map which contains information regarding the shape (604) of the structure is compared (606) to average shape characterizing population groups. If the shape of the new image falls within a best match probability with an average shape, the new image is classified (607) as a member of the population characterized by the average shape. Thus, if the shape of the new structure resembles the average shape of a population group, the new shape is classified as the same population state as the other structures displaying the same shape characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/42; G06K 9/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/055 (2006.01); G06K 9/62 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/6255 (2013.01); G06K 9/6206 (2013.01); G06K 9/6214 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964983 A1 19991216; WO 9964983 A9 20000831; AU 4424499 A 19991230; CA 2334272 A1 19991216; EP 1086440 A1 20010328; EP 1086440 A4 20060322; JP 2002517867 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2009-07-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081120

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060711

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060711

2006-03-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060206

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HALLER, JOHN, W.

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MILLER, MICHAEL, I.

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CSERNANSKY, JOHN, G.

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GRENANDER, ULF

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JOSHI, SARANG, C.

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROWN UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL SE