Global Patent Index - EP 1086455 A1

EP 1086455 A1 2001-03-28 - COMPATIBLE DIGITAL SOUNDTRACKS FOR 70 MM MOTION PICTURE FILM

Title (en)

COMPATIBLE DIGITAL SOUNDTRACKS FOR 70 MM MOTION PICTURE FILM

Title (de)

KOMPATIBLE DIGITALE TONSPUREN FÜR 70MM KINOFILM

Title (fr)

BANDES SON NUMERIQUES COMPATIBLES POUR FILM CINEMATOGRAPHIQUE 70 MM

Publication

EP 1086455 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927513 A

Priority

  • US 9913337 W
  • US 9838898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966503A1] Dolby Digital and Sony SDDS digital signal carrying optical symbols on large-format motion picture film (e.g., film having any of the various 70 mm formats) are recorded in such a way as to permit existing 35 mm optical readers and signal decoders to recover the soundtracks with little or no modification. The normal format of a motion picture soundtrack in the form of a two-dimensional array of photographically recorded symbols (10) representing digital information intended for application to 35 mm motion picture film is modified by stretching the symbols (10) in the direction in which the motion picture film is transported when played, the degree of stretching being commensurate with the increase in film speed of the large-format motion picture film with respect to said 35 mm motion picture film. The stretched format soundtrack is applied to the large-format motion picture film, whereby when said large-format motion picture film is played the information recovered is essentially the same as the information recovered from 35 mm motion picture film to which the normal format of said motion picture soundtrack is applied.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/00; G03B 31/02; G11B 20/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 31/02 (2006.01); G06K 19/06 (2006.01); G11B 7/003 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/06037 (2013.01); G03B 31/02 (2013.01); G11B 7/0032 (2013.01); G11B 20/1261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966503A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966503 A1 19991223; WO 9966503 A9 20000330; AU 4440099 A 20000105; AU 751229 B2 20020808; DE 69919866 D1 20041007; DE 69919866 T2 20050825; EP 1086455 A1 20010328; EP 1086455 B1 20040901; US 6011610 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090611

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919866 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB