Global patent index - EP 1086498 A1

EP 1086498 A1 2001-03-28 - OPTICAL SEMICONDUCTOR DIODE

Title (en)

OPTICAL SEMICONDUCTOR DIODE

Title (de)

OPTISCHE HALBLEITERDIODE

Title (fr)

DIODE OPTIQUE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1086498 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00914057 A

Priority

  • DE 0000665 W
  • DE 19914716 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060675A1] The invention relates to an optical semiconductor diode (1) in which at least one intermediate layer (4) is positioned between an epitaxial layer stack (2) on a surface region (11) of a substrate (10) and said surface region. The intermediate layer contacts the surface region on its flat side such that it partly covers same and partly leaves it exposed and reflects a part (32) of a radiation (30) generated in the layer stack in the direction of the surface region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/10 (2010.01); H01L 33/22 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/10 (2013.01); H01L 33/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0060675A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060675 A1 20001012; EP 1086498 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090314

2008-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20081103

2008-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE