Global Patent Index - EP 1086510 A1

EP 1086510 A1 2001-03-28 - E SA

Title (en)

E SA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON AMPLITUDEN UND PHASEN VON VERSCHIEDENEN WEGEN EINER SENDEGRUPPENANTENNE FÜR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE SIGNALE UND ANTENNE GEMÄSS DIESEM VERFAHREN SOWIE SIGNALE FÜR EINEN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSATELLITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA DETERMINATION DES AMPLITUDES ET PHASES DES DIFFERENTES VOIES D'UN RESEAU D'EMISSION DE SIGNAUX ELECTROMAGNETIQUES, TEL QU'UNE ANTENNE DE SATELLITE DE TELECOMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1086510 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99923667 A

Priority

  • FR 9901318 W
  • FR 9807021 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779578A1] The invention concerns a method for determining amplitudes and phases of the different channels in an electromagnetic signal transmission network whereof the sources are arranged in a triangular lattice. Said method is characterised in that consists in tiling said lattice with hexagons having six equal sides, the hexagonal tiles formed being distributed on said lattice such that two successive tiles along a direction in the lattice rectangular height equivalent to said triangular lattice are offset by an elementary step along the width direction, and in performing a Fourier transform on the resulting tiling; in selecting on the resulting new lattice the directions corresponding to the transmission directions; in performing an inverse Fourier transform of said directions and in deducing from said inverse Fourier transform the amplitude and phase coefficients to be applied to the transmission network different channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/06 (2006.01); H01Q 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963625A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779578 A1 19991210; FR 2779578 B1 20021129; DE 69903294 D1 20021107; DE 69903294 T2 20030911; EP 1086510 A1 20010328; EP 1086510 B1 20021002; JP 2002517926 A 20020618; JP 4180241 B2 20081112; US 6678521 B1 20040113; WO 9963625 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130604

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130604

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903294

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130604

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903294 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-09-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AMPLITUDE AND PHASE DETERMINATION METHOD FOR THE DIFFERENT CHANNELS OF AN ANTENNA ARRAY AND SATELLITE ANTENNA ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT