Global Patent Index - EP 1086511 A1

EP 1086511 A1 2001-03-28 - INSULATION PIERCING CONNECTING DEVICE

Title (en)

INSULATION PIERCING CONNECTING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHNEIDKLEMME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERCE-ISOLANT

Publication

EP 1086511 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936361 A

Priority

  • DE 9901593 W
  • DE 19825627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965110A1] The invention relates to an insulation piercing connecting device for contacting a non-striped terminal of an electrical conductor. The opposite contact arms (3, 4) of the insulation piercing connecting device encompass a gap (5) for insulation piercing connection that is shaped in the form of an inverted Y. The edges (7, 8) of the head of the Y-shape delimiting an insertion hole (6) and forming a V-shape in relation to each other form a cutting area to pierce the conductor insulation. The edges (9, 10) of the base of the Y-shape that are substantially parallel in relation to each other form a clamping contact area (24). The edges (7, 8) of the head of the Y-shape are undulated in their longitudinal direction in the form of a knife for domestic use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2437 (2013.01); H01R 4/2425 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965110A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965110 A1 19991216; CN 1125503 C 20031022; CN 1305653 A 20010725; EP 1086511 A1 20010328; EP 1086511 B1 20020821; JP 2002518797 A 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902413 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT