Global Patent Index - EP 1086512 B1

EP 1086512 B1 2002-12-04 - INSULATION PIERCING CONNECTING DEVICE

Title (en)

INSULATION PIERCING CONNECTING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHNEIDKLEMME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERCE-ISOLANT

Publication

EP 1086512 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936369 A

Priority

  • DE 9901601 W
  • DE 19825566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965113A1] In order to obtain reliable contact of a non-striped electrical conductor (2) in a V-shaped contact area (6) throughout a large cross-sectional area, e.g. 0.5 to 2.5 mm<2>, using the cutting edges (10, 11) of two clamp arms facing each other in a screwless insulation piercing connecting device, the cutting flanks (11, 12) of the cutting edges (10, 11) have an undulated shape. The width (b, b', b") of the contact surfaces formed by the cutting edges (10, 11) alternately increase and decrease in the direction of tape ring (14) of the contact area (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 43/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 43/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2416 (2013.01); H01R 4/2433 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965113 A1 19991216; CN 1140012 C 20040225; CN 1303530 A 20010711; EP 1086512 A1 20010328; EP 1086512 B1 20021204; JP 2002518798 A 20020625; JP 4261771 B2 20090430

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903658 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT