Global patent index - EP 1086514 A1

EP 1086514 A1 2001-03-28 - CONNECTING TERMINAL

Title (en)

CONNECTING TERMINAL

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSKLEMME

Title (fr)

BORNE DE CONNEXION

Publication

EP 1086514 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936371 A

Priority

  • DE 9901603 W
  • DE 19825626 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965115A2] The invention relates to a connecting terminal, comprising an electrically insulating base body (1) with a width (d) and a first pair of interacting parts (2) for receiving a conductor and provided with electrically insulating outer sides (2'). A conductor (6) with a cross-section that can vary to a maximum can be clamped in between the parts (2) receiving the conductor. Said outer sides (2') have an outer distance (a) between each other. In order to create a compact connecting terminal, the maximum outer distance (a) in the receiving parts without a conductor is as large as the width (d) of the base body and when a conductor (6) with a maximum cross-section is arranged between the parts (2) receiving the conductor, the outer distance (a) is larger than the width (d) of the base body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 4/28; H01R 11/01; H01R 13/631

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2412 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965115A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965115 A2 19991216; WO 9965115 A3 20000217; EP 1086514 A1 20010328; EP 1086514 B1 20031112

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907729

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020405

2001-04-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ADLFINGER, PETER

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BUSCH, KLAUS

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GIESELMANN, MICHAEL

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HERRMANN, JOHANN

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOFRICHTER, JOHANN

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOERGEL, NORBERT

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, RUDOLF

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EIDLOTH, RAINER

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT