Global Patent Index - EP 1086515 A1

EP 1086515 A1 2001-03-28 - SPRING CLAMP

Title (en)

SPRING CLAMP

Title (de)

FEDERKRAFTKLEMME

Title (fr)

BORNE A RESSORT

Publication

EP 1086515 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936367 A

Priority

  • DE 9901599 W
  • DE 19825629 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825629A1] The invention relates to a spring clamp having a clamping body (2) arranged in a connecting area (1), by means of which an electrical conductor (3) with an axle (4) that is inserted in the connecting area (1) can be clamped in a clamping position using the force of a spring. In order to produce an easy to use spring clamp, the invention provides for the clamping body (2) to be held in a pretensioned position before inserting the conductor (3) into the connecting area (1) and for the clamping body (2) to be released after the conductor (3) has been inserted into the connecting area (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48; F16H 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/52 (2006.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01); H01R 4/2404 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825629 A1 19991216; DE 19825629 B4 20070606; CN 1169260 C 20040929; CN 1301418 A 20010627; EP 1086515 A1 20010328; EP 1086515 B1 20020814; JP 2002518800 A 20020625; JP 4246916 B2 20090402; WO 9965116 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902357 20020919

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT