Global Patent Index - EP 1086567 A1

EP 1086567 A1 2001-03-28 - AUTOMATIC ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE DOKUMENTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONIQUES

Publication

EP 1086567 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911618 A

Priority

US 9804928 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946913A1] The systems of the present invention consist of one or more "HOME"s (109) where there is a "DAD" computer and software system for human user interaction to initiate Jobs (Transcription, Translation, Data Entry, and Transation Creation) and utilize voice-mail through real time voice and tone signal input, and "HIS" computer and software system for keeping the databases used to process Jobs and for keeping the statistical records of jobs for analysis, general ledger, payroll and billing. In addition, the system of the present invention consists of one or more "MOM"s (103, 104, 105) where there is a software system server on a computer set on the backbone of the global communication network (e.g. Internet) (102) that receives Job packets from its HOMEs (109), selects Scribes (106, 107, 108) for work (e.g. transcription), generates messages in the form of E-mail and Voice-Mail to specified users for information or action, updates the status of the Job Record and transferring that updated Record to a SUPERMOM (101), implements all the details of job processing steps and logic that has been controlled by Human Supervisors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); H04M 1/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01); H04M 1/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946913 A1 19990916; WO 9946913 A9 20000302; AU 6553698 A 19990927; AU 758215 B2 20030320; CA 2352894 A1 19990916; CA 2352894 C 20070605; EP 1086567 A1 20010328; EP 1086567 A4 20050126; IL 142436 D0 20020310

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033625

2013-05-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-02-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2005-01-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 A

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010109;LT PAYMENT 20010109;LV PAYMENT 20010109;MK PAYMENT 20010109;RO PAYMENT 20010109;SI PAYMENT 20010109