Global Patent Index - EP 1086578 A1

EP 1086578 A1 2001-03-28 - CMOS INTEGRATION SENSOR WITH FULLY DIFFERENTIAL COLUMN READOUT CIRCUIT FOR LIGHT ADAPTIVE IMAGING

Title (en)

CMOS INTEGRATION SENSOR WITH FULLY DIFFERENTIAL COLUMN READOUT CIRCUIT FOR LIGHT ADAPTIVE IMAGING

Title (de)

CMOS-INTEGRATIONSSENSOR MIT VOLL DIFFERENTIELLER SPALTENAUSLESESCHALTUNG ZUMHELLICHKEITSADAPTIVEN ABBILDEN

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR D'INTEGRATION CMOS COMPRENANT UN CIRCUIT TOTALEMENT DIFFERENTIEL DE LECTURE DE COLONNES AUX FINS D'IMAGERIE ADAPTATIVE A LA LUMIERE

Publication

EP 1086578 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912623 A

Priority

  • US 9905830 W
  • US 7817298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948281A1] An imager (10) that is better suited for low-light detection capability. In accordance with a preferred embodiment, the imager may be easily configured to provide an imager (10) having multi-resolution capability where SNR can be adjusted for optimum low-level detectibility. Multi-resolution signal processing functionality is provided on-chip to achieve high speed imaging, employs an improved pixel binning approach with fully differential circuits situated so that all extraneous and pick-up noise is eliminated. The current implementation requires no frame transfer memory, thereby reducing chip size. The reduction in area enables larger area format light adaptive imager implementations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/335 (2006.01); H04N 3/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 3/1562 (2013.01); H04N 3/1512 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948281 A1 19990923; AU 3096199 A 19991011; EP 1086578 A1 20010328; EP 1086578 A4 20010926; JP 2002507863 A 20020312; JP 3708824 B2 20051019

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060815

2001-09-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 3/14 A, 7H 04N 3/15 B

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PAIN, BEDABRATA

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHOU, ZHIMIN

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOSSUM, ERIC, R.

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB