Global patent index - EP 1086606 A1

EP 1086606 A1 2001-03-28 - PANEL LOUDSPEAKERS

Title (en)

PANEL LOUDSPEAKERS

Title (de)

PLATTENLAUTSPRECHER

Title (fr)

HAUT-PARLEURS A PANNEAUX

Publication

EP 1086606 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924965 A

Priority

  • DE 19825866 A
  • EP 9903307 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825866A1] The invention relates to the embodiment of so-called panel loudspeakers working according to the bending wave principle. Said panels are generally formed by a panel (11), at least one driver (12) and a frame (13), the panel (11) being connected to the frame (13). In order to achieve appropriate bending wave induction in the panel (11), very complicated assessments must be made in order to determine the corresponding positioning areas (15) in which the driver (12) excites the panel (11) or is connected to the latter. Furthermore, the size of the panels (11) can change considerably depending on the application so that assessments must only be made repeatedly in the case of panels that can be easily modified. The invention aims at providing general positioning areas (15) for the driver (12) in or on the panels (11) so that no further assessments need to be carried out regarding the positioning area (15). To this end, an edge area (16) attached directly to the edges (13) of the panel (11) and a center of gravity area (17) extending along the center of gravity (S) of the panel (11) are discarded from the very beginning as positioning area (15). Specifications with respect to the width or enlargement of the different zones (16, 17) in relation to the dimension of the panel (11) are also given.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965273A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825866 A1 19991216; EP 1086606 A1 20010328; EP 1086606 B1 20020410; JP 2002518910 A 20020625; US 6836552 B1 20041228; WO 9965273 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901200

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-05-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20070131

2006-10-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030110

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040515

2003-05-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-05-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030521

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2003-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901200

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE