Global patent index - EP 1086633 A1

EP 1086633 A1 2001-03-28 - Rucksack

Title (en)

Rucksack

Title (de)

Rucksack

Title (fr)

Sac à dos

Publication

EP 1086633 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00111660 A

Priority

JP 725999 U

Abstract (en)

A rucksack is provided on its rear surface with a flap (5) which serves as a cover attached at its lower edge to the rucksack body (2). A waterproof skirt (20) is attached to the inside of the flap. When not in use the skirt is housed within the flap which is kept closed. In the event of rain the flap and the skirt can be deployed over the main body of the rucksack thus protecting the contents of the rucksack from the rain. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/04; A45C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/00 (2006.01); A45F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2013.01); A45C 13/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086633 A1 20010328; CN 2425558 Y 20010404; GB 0007926 D0 20000517; GB 2354430 A 20010328; GB 2354430 B 20010808

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040910

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030520

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI