Global Patent Index - EP 1086645 A2

EP 1086645 A2 2001-03-28 - Partition for a shower

Title (en)

Partition for a shower

Title (de)

Trennwand für eine Dusche

Title (fr)

Cloison pour une douche

Publication

EP 1086645 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119549 A

Priority

DE 19945198 A

Abstract (en)

The shower partition has a hinge with strips (7, 8) on either side into which the door (9) fits, with fixing plates (6, 10) on the other side of the door. These are fastened together, e.g. by screws (5). One of the fixing plates (10) extends across the axis (23) of the hinge, the overlapping section (13) acting as a stop for the door in the closed position.

Abstract (de)

Trennwand für eine Dusche mit mindestens einer um eine vertikale Achse mittels Bänder verschwenkbare Tür, wobei die Bänder Verbindungselement aufweisen, die eine Glasscheibe durchdringen und auf einer Seite der Glasscheibe in einem Bandlappen und auf der anderen Seite der Glasscheibe in einer Gegenplatte verankert sind, wobei eine der Gegenplatten sich beidseitig über die vertikale Achse (Drehpunkt des Bandes) hinaus erstreckt, wobei der auskragende Teil der Gegenplatten als Anschlag für die Tür im geschlossenen Zustand dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36; E05D 5/02; E05D 11/06; E05F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05F 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E05F 5/02 (2013.01); E05D 11/06 (2013.01); E05D 2005/0269 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/162 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4322567 C1 19940728 - MUNCH PAUL JEAN [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086645 A2 20010328; EP 1086645 A3 20030514; DE 19945198 A1 20010412; DE 19945198 C2 20030109

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI