Global patent index - EP 1086647 A1

EP 1086647 A1 2001-03-28 - Vacuum cleaner with filter cassette

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner with filter cassette

Title (de)

Staubsauger mit Filterkassette

Title (fr)

Aspirateur avec cassette de filtres

Publication

EP 1086647 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120441 A

Priority

DE 29916719 U

Abstract (en)

The vacuum cleaner has a suction fan for the working air, a drive motor for the suction fan. a cooling fan for the drive motor, separate cooling and working (4) air channels. The cooling air channel outlet from the housing (3) is arranged next to the working air channel outlet (5). A filter cassette (12) arranged directly before the air outlet openings has filter regions (14) for the cooling and working air. The filter regions are separated from each other within the cassette for flow purposes.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Staubsauger mit einem Sauggebläse (1) für die Arbeitsluft, einem Antriebsmotor (6) für das Sauggebläse (1), einem Kühlgebläse (7) für den Antriebsmotor (6) und mit getrennten Luftkanälen (10,4) für Kühlluft und Arbeitsluft. Um einen derartigen Staubsauger derart weiterzubilden, daß die Abgabe von Kohleabrieb des Antriebsmotors (6) aus dem Kühlluftstrom in die Umgebungsluft und von feinsten Schmutzpartikeln aus dem Arbeitsluftstrom in die Umgebungsluft auf einfache und kostengünstige Weise vermieden wird, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß der Auslaß (11) des Kühlluftkanals (10) aus dem Gehäuse (3) neben dem Auslaß (5) des Arbeitsluftkanals (4) aus dem Gehäuse (3) angeordnet ist, daß stromabwärts unmittelbar vor den Luftauslaßöffnungen (5,11) eine Filterkassette (12) vorgesehen ist, welche einen Filterbereich (13) für die Kühlluft und einen Filterbereich (14) für die Arbeitsluft aufweist, wobei die Filterbereiche (13,14) innerhalb der Filterkassette (12) strömungstechnisch voneinander getrennt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/12; A47L 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916719 U1 20000120; EP 1086647 A1 20010328; EP 1086647 B1 20040331

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070919

2006-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060801

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005872

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI