Global Patent Index - EP 1086680 A2

EP 1086680 A2 2001-03-28 - Adjustable support for stretchers

Title (en)

Adjustable support for stretchers

Title (de)

Verstellbare Stütze für eine Krankentrage

Title (fr)

Support réglable pour brancards

Publication

EP 1086680 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500077 A

Priority

ES 9902427 U

Abstract (en)

A polypositionable support applicable as clinical use stretcher, consisting of a tabular body (6) fitted with an integral polyurethane foam covering on its sharp cants, stringers constituting two conventional folding devices being articulated at the upper tabular body (6), these folding devices being mobilized by means of pneumatic cylinders (3) and (3'), being articulated at the lower zone by means their fixing to the stringers, having horizontal sliders (4) and driving pedals of the pneumatic pistons. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 1/06 (2006.01); A61G 7/012 (2006.01); A61G 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 1/06 (2013.01); A61G 7/012 (2013.01); A61G 13/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086680 A2 20010328; EP 1086680 A3 20021016; CN 2427191 Y 20010425; ES 1044404 U 20000501; ES 1044404 Y 20000901; HU 0000117 V0 20000728; HU 2198 U 20020128

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051103

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI