Global Patent Index - EP 1086724 A1

EP 1086724 A1 2001-03-28 - Double laminating method and machine for manufacturing a hockey stick shaft, and hockey stick shaft made therefrom

Title (en)

Double laminating method and machine for manufacturing a hockey stick shaft, and hockey stick shaft made therefrom

Title (de)

Doppellaminierverfahren und -Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines Hockeyschlägerschafts und dadurch hergestellter Hockeyschlägerschaft

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de double laminage pour produire un manche de crosse de hockey et manche de crosse de hockey ainsi produit

Publication

EP 1086724 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00402222 A

Priority

CA 2279628 A

Abstract (en)

A method for making a hockey stick shaft by a double pressing process, and an apparatus for making the same. The double pressing process consists of pulling resin soaked rovings through heated mold cavities. A core is inserted between upper and lower rovings, the press is closed, and upper and lower laminates are molded on simultaneously, using heat and pressure. The hockey stick shaft made therefrom has two opposite surfaces, each of the surfaces being provided with a fiberglass roving reinforcement along each opposite edge and a graphite roving reinforcement fiber between the two fiberglass roving means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 59/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 59/70 (2015.01); B29C 70/08 (2006.01); B29C 70/46 (2006.01); B29C 70/50 (2006.01); B29C 70/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 70/088 (2013.01); A63B 59/70 (2015.10); B29C 70/462 (2013.01); B29C 70/50 (2013.01); B29C 70/525 (2013.01); A63B 2102/24 (2015.10); A63B 2209/00 (2013.01); B29K 2711/14 (2013.01); B29L 2031/52 (2013.01); B29L 2031/5227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086724 A1 20010328; CA 2279628 A1 20010204; US 6696001 B1 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FI

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI