Global patent index - EP 1086733 A1

EP 1086733 A1 2001-03-28 - Device for selective imitation of human or animal actions by a robotic character when certain objects are placed near the robotic character

Title (en)

Device for selective imitation of human or animal actions by a robotic character when certain objects are placed near the robotic character

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die selektive Imitation von menschlichen oder tierischen Aktionen bei einem Roboter, wenn verschiedene Objekte in die Nähe des Roboters plaziert werden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'imitation sélective d'actions humaines ou animales chez un caractère robotique, quand des objets différents sont placés prés du caractère robotique

Publication

EP 1086733 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203142 A

Priority

EP 99203142 A

Abstract (en)

Device for selective imitation of human or animal actions by a robotic character when certain objects are placed in the neighborhood of the robotic doll, comprising of one or more automatically movable robot dolls, which in principle can have every appearance and every suitable mechanical and/or electronic movement/ and control device, which is necessary for a specific application and also comprises of an electronic system which can recognize specially prepared objects in an area around the robot doll and can thereafter control the robot doll in such a way, that this one imitates certain human or animal acts when it recognizes corresponding specific objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 3/24; A63H 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/24 (2006.01); A63H 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/24 (2013.01); A63H 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086733 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030429

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK GB NL

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB NL

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI