Global Patent Index - EP 1086747 A1

EP 1086747 A1 2001-03-28 - A rotary blade chopping machine having stationaray toothed bars acting as counterblades and grid

Title (en)

A rotary blade chopping machine having stationaray toothed bars acting as counterblades and grid

Title (de)

Rotierende Schneidmesservorrichtung mit als Gegenmessern oder Gitter wirkenden stationären verzahnten Leisten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe à couteaux rotatifs comportant des bares fixes et dentées en tant que contre-lames ou grille

Publication

EP 1086747 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107738 A

Priority

IT MI992003 A

Abstract (en)

A chopping or shredding machine with multiple rollers (14, 15, 16) rotating on parallel axe, each roller comprising a plurality of toothed disc blades in longitudinally staggered positions on adjacent rollers, the machine comprising a plurality (20) of stationary lower toothed bars (22) assembled one near the other, but not in contact. The toothed bars (22) collaborate to the shredding of the material as counterblades and they further define openings having the function of a grate. They can also be disassembled and reassembled also separately in order to remove possible clogging, for being resharpened or replaced; they can be assembled as a circular arc, or as a sew-teeth shape with respect to said circular arc. A better shredding is obtained and clogging due to bunching of material are easily avoided or solved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/14; B02C 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/18 (2006.01); B02C 18/22 (2006.01); B02C 23/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 23/16 (2013.01); B02C 18/142 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT 1264541 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086747 A1 20010328; IT 1313631 B1 20020909; IT MI992003 A1 20010327; IT MI992003 D0 19990927; JP 2001104813 A 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060714

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SATRIND S.P.A.

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010407

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI