Global Patent Index - EP 1086750 A2

EP 1086750 A2 2001-03-28 - Mobile device for aspirating overspray produced by lacquer spraying

Title (en)

Mobile device for aspirating overspray produced by lacquer spraying

Title (de)

Fahrbare Einrichtung zum Absaugen des beim Spritzlackieren entstehenden Farbnebels

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration de la matière de laquage à partir de l'excédent produit lors du laquage par pulvérisation

Publication

EP 1086750 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890224 A

Priority

AT 58199 U

Abstract (en)

A device for sucking off paint mist by using paint mist separator filters (5) and a suction fan (7) has an oblong casing (1) on wheels. The filters with pocket filters behind them are fitted on the casing's side opened by doors (3,3'). During spray painting operations the opened side of the casing faces any paint mist that occurs. Because of the sucking operation of the suction fan paint mist is pulled through the paint mist separator filter and filtered by it.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einrichtung zum Absaugen des beim Spritzlackieren entstehenden Farbnebels mittels Farbnebelabscheidefiltern (5) und eines Absaugeventilators (7) weist einen fahrbaren länglichen Kasten (1) auf. An der durch Türen (3,3') öffenbaren Seite des fahrbaren Kastens (1) sind Farbnebelabscheidefilter (5) und dahinter Taschenfilter angeordnet. Die geöffnete Seite des fahrbaren Kastens (1) wird im Betrieb beim Spritzlackieren dem dabei entstehenden Farbnebel zugewandt. Aufgrund der Ansaugwirkung eines Absaugeventilators (7) wird der Farbnebel durch das im fahrbaren länglichen Kasten (1) befindliche Farbnebelabscheidefilter (5) und das dahinter befindliche Taschenfilter gezogen und dadurch gefiltert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/1296 (2013.01); B05B 15/1248 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086750 A2 20010328; EP 1086750 A3 20020904; EP 1086750 B1 20040915; AT 3906 U1 20001025; DE 50007753 D1 20041021

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050705

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060719

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060719

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050705

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050111

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007753 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI