Global patent index - EP 1086759 A1

EP 1086759 A1 2001-03-28 - Eccentric pipe for constructing an underground pipe ceiling and method for the production of an underground pipe ceiling by using a plurality of such pipes

Title (en)

Eccentric pipe for constructing an underground pipe ceiling and method for the production of an underground pipe ceiling by using a plurality of such pipes

Title (de)

Exzentrisches Rohrelement zum Herstellen einer unterirdischen Decke sowie Verfahren zum Herstellen einer unterirdischen Decke unter Verwendung dieser Rohrelemente

Title (fr)

Elément tubulaire excentrique pour réaliser un plafond souterrain et procédé de réalisation d'un plafond souterrain utilisant lesdits éléments tubulaires

Publication

EP 1086759 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00870212 A

Priority

BE 9900637 A

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a pipe for spanning a room, which pipe (1) comprises an essentially cylindrical outer wall (2) and an essentially cylindrical inner wall (3), the inner wall (3) being excentrically mounted with respect to the outer wall (2). A method for the production of an underground pipe ceiling by using a plurality of such pipes is also disclosed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/15; B21D 47/01; E04B 9/06; E04C 1/00; E21D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086759 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040712

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI