Global Patent Index - EP 1086763 A1

EP 1086763 A1 2001-03-28 - Twin roll strip casting device

Title (en)

Twin roll strip casting device

Title (de)

Bandgiessmaschine zur Erzeugung eines Metallbandes

Title (fr)

Appareil de coulée de bande a deux cylindres

Publication

EP 1086763 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811002 A

Priority

CH 175199 A

Abstract (en)

Continuous casting machine has casting rolls (22, 24) and side seals (25) surrounded by a closable housing (30) which has an opening (30') on its upper side for the casting tube extending between the rolls and an opening (30'') on its lower side for the metal strip produced. The openings are sealed and the inside (33) of the housing is filled with a protective inert gas during casting. Preferred Features: The housing is arranged laterally as well as above the casting rolls and/or the machine stand (32). The housing has horizontally moving doors (35) located directly above the rolls.

Abstract (de)

Eine Bandgiessmaschine (20) zur Erzeugung eines Metallbandes ist mit zwei nebeneinander angeordneten, einen Giessspalt (15') bildenden Giessrollen (22, 24) versehen, an welchen stirnseitig Seitenabdichtungen (25) angeordnet sind, und sie auf einem Maschinenständer (32) drehbar gelagert sind. Die Giessrollen (22, 24) mit dem Maschinenständer (32) und den Seitenabdichtungen (25) sind rundum von einem verschliessbaren Gehäuse (30) umgeben, welches auf seiner Oberseite eine jeweilige Öffnung (30') für das sich zwischen die Giessrollen (22, 24) erstreckende Giessrohr (13) oder dergleichen und auf der Unterseite eine Öffnung (30") für das austretende Metallband (15) aufweist, wobei diese Öffnungen (30', 30") abgedichtet sind und das Gehäuseinnere (33) während des Giessens mit einem Schutzgas, vorzugsweise einem Inertgas, gefüllt ist. Hieraus ergibt sich eine optimale Abdichtung des zwischen den Giessrollen befindlichen Metallbades und des austretenden Bandes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0697 (2013.01); B22D 11/0622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9402269 A1 19940203 - ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP], et al
  • [DA] WO 9734718 A1 19970925 - ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP], et al
  • [DA] EP 0780177 A2 19970625 - ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 278 (M - 623) 9 September 1987 (1987-09-09)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 129 (M - 1228) 2 April 1992 (1992-04-02)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 03 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 178 (M - 1110) 8 May 1991 (1991-05-08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086763 A1 20010328; AT 271434 T 20040815; AU 7420300 A 20010430; CH 691576 A5 20010831; DE 50007148 D1 20040826; EP 1214163 A1 20020619; EP 1214163 B1 20040721; US 2004040689 A1 20040304; US 7121322 B2 20061017; WO 0123120 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010929

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI