Global Patent Index - EP 1086781 A2

EP 1086781 A2 2001-03-28 - Tool transfer device for machine tools

Title (en)

Tool transfer device for machine tools

Title (de)

Werkzeugtransfervorrichtung für Werkzeugmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert d'outil pour machine-outils

Publication

EP 1086781 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00118515 A

Priority

JP 24084099 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a tool transfer device for machine tools capable of reducing the tool transfer time and also reducing the cost by eliminating the need for any driving source. In a tool transfer device for machine tools, having a tool magazine 10 set beside a spindle 6 on which a tool is mounted, and serving for accommodating and holding therein a multiplicity of tools so that the tools are directed perpendicular to an axis of the spindle 6, and a transfer pot 23 set on a spindle side of the tool magazine 10, and driven and moved by a horizontally moving unit 21 and a vertically moving unit 22, wherein a next-process tool T1 accommodated in the tool magazine 10 is taken out and transferred horizontally to a stroke end position P2 by the transfer pot 23, and the next-process tool T1 is tilted at the stroke end position P2 to a tool changing position p1 in which the next-process tool T1 is parallel to the axis of the spindle 6, the tool transfer device comprises tool tilting means (tilted cam member 38, tilting cam member 39) for tilting the next-process tool T1 to the tool changing position P1 by horizontal movement of the horizontally moving unit 21 to the stroke end position P2. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 3/157

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 3/157 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23Q 3/15773 (2013.01); Y10T 483/10 (2013.01); Y10T 483/176 (2013.01); Y10T 483/1783 (2013.01); Y10T 483/1788 (2013.01); Y10T 483/1836 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086781 A2 20010328; EP 1086781 A3 20011107; EP 1086781 B1 20031217; DE 60007248 D1 20040129; DE 60007248 T2 20040909; JP 2001062660 A 20010313; US 6325748 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007248 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI