Global patent index - EP 1086784 A2

EP 1086784 A2 2001-03-28 - Fitting tensioner for mounting impellers

Title (en)

Fitting tensioner for mounting impellers

Title (de)

Nippelspanner für die Laufradmontage

Title (fr)

Tensionneur de raccord pour montage de rotor

Publication

EP 1086784 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119147 A

Priority

DE 29916709 U

Abstract (en)

The nipple tension jack has a basic body (1) which has a forked open end (4) for placing on a spoke, and a drive pulley (5) mounted inside it with several cog wheels (6-8). The last cog wheel (8) facing the forked open end is slit lengthwise to grip over the spoke, and has a container space containing a lengthwise slit tensioning ball (10) with a square cross-section. A lengthwise slit protective sleeve (23) is mounted on the basic body.

Abstract (de)

Ein Nippelspanner für die Laufradmontage, ist mit einem Grundkörper (1) versehen, der ein gabelförmig offenes Ende (4) zum Aufsetzen auf eine Speiche und einen darin gelagerten Antriebszug (5) mit mehreren Zahnrädern (6, 7, 8) aufweist. Das dem gabelförmig offenen Ende (4) des Grundkörpers (1) zugekehrte letzte Zahnrad (8) ist zum Übergriff über die Speiche längs geschlitzt ausgebildet und weist einen Aufnahmeraum auf, in dem eine längs geschlitze Spannkugel (10) mit einem zum Drehangriff an einem Nippel bestimmten Vierkantquerschnitt untergebracht ist. Es ist eine längs geschlitzte Schutzhülse (23) vorgesehen, die an dem Grundkörper (1) undrehbar gelagert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/48; B25B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/48 (2006.01); B25B 17/00 (2006.01); B25B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/0071 (2013.01); B25B 13/48 (2013.01); B25B 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916709 U1 20000127; EP 1086784 A2 20010328; EP 1086784 A3 20021030

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI