Global Patent Index - EP 1086789 A1

EP 1086789 A1 2001-03-28 - Semi-automatic bread-slicer equipped with a security hood

Title (en)

Semi-automatic bread-slicer equipped with a security hood

Title (de)

Halbautomatische Brotschneidemaschine mit Schutzhaube

Title (fr)

Machine à couper le pain semi-automatique pourvue d'un capot de sécurité

Publication

EP 1086789 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99203161 A

Priority

EP 99203161 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a cap with members (4) for moving this cap (2), these members adapted to cooperate with the bread pushing device (1), such that the cap moves to the open position when the bread pushing device reaches the rear return position. The cap moving member is for conferring to the cap, a position of stable opening and a closed stable position. The cap is equally mounted with a device by which the cutting cycle starts first when the cap is in the closed position. The cap is equipped with a locking device (17,18) for locking the cap in the closed position during the cutting cycle.

Abstract (fr)

Une machine semi-automatique munie d'un capot et équipée de moyens (4) pour la mise en mouvement du capot (2), lesquels moyens sont agencés pour coopérer avec le dispositif pousse-pain (1) de manière que le capot (2) soit amené vers sa position d'ouverture lorsque le dispositif pousse-pain arrive vers sa position de recul arrière. Avantageusement, les moyens de mise en mouvement du capot sont agencés pour conférer au capot (2) une position d'ouverture stable et une position de fermeture stable. Le capot est également muni d'un dispositif par lequel le cycle de coupe démarre uniquement lorsque le capot se trouve dans sa position de fermeture. De préférence, ie capot est en outre doté d'un dispositif de verrouillage (17, 18; 27, 28) agencé pour verrouiller le capot (2) dans sa position de fermeture pendant le cycle de coupe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/22; B26D 7/00; B26D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/22 (2013.01); B26D 7/00 (2013.01); B26D 7/0608 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086789 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI