Global Patent Index - EP 1086817 A2

EP 1086817 A2 2001-03-28 - Printer assembly and printer

Title (en)

Printer assembly and printer

Title (de)

Druckeranordnung und Drucker

Title (fr)

Assemblage d'impression et imprimante

Publication

EP 1086817 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120421 A

Priority

JP 26736699 A

Abstract (en)

A printer (1) and a printer assembly (10) of the present invention includes: a line thermal head (11); a platen roller (12) having surface of high coefficient of friction for holding a printing paper between the platen roller and the line thermal head to feed the printing paper; supporting rollers (13a;13b) having surface of low coefficient of friction, disposed at front and rear of the platen roller along a paper feeding direction so as to support the platen roller from a side opposed to the line thermal head; a supporting plate (14) extending along the supporting rollers so as to receive the surfaces of the supporting rollers from a side opposed to the line thermal head; and pressurizing means for applying pressure between the supporting plate and the line thermal head. The platen roller is supported along its longitudinal direction by the supporting plate via the supporting rollers comprising a small member with low coefficient of friction. Accordingly, even when the diameter of a platen roller is small, it is possible to apply sufficient pressure on to the line thermal head, and thin and compact printer assembly and printer can be provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 3/36 (2006.01); B41J 11/04 (2006.01); B41J 29/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/04 (2013.01); B41J 3/36 (2013.01); B41J 29/023 (2013.01); B41J 29/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086817 A2 20010328; EP 1086817 A3 20010516; JP 2001088376 A 20010403; JP 4169440 B2 20081022

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060905

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050315

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI