Global Patent Index - EP 1086848 A2

EP 1086848 A2 2001-03-28 - Hybrid vehicle

Title (en)

Hybrid vehicle

Title (de)

Hybridfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule hybride

Publication

EP 1086848 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119388 A

Priority

JP 26984799 A

Abstract (en)

An altitude calculation unit 44 estimates an inclination of a road from vehicle speed and vehicle drive torque, and calculates altitude of a vehicle. A battery management unit 43 calculate difference between average altitude determined from the past altitude history and the present altitude and varies a target value of battery charging rate or upper and lower limit values thereof in response to the difference. Charging and discharging command value is calculated in response to difference between charging rate detection value and the target value or the upper and lower limit values. An integrated control unit 22 sets output share between an engine and a motor based on vehicle target drive torque calculated by a target toque determination unit 21 and charging and discharging command from the battery management unit 43, determines an optimum operation point of the engine and issues a control command to the engine and the motor. Thereby, even when a travelling route ahead of the vehicle is not set, a possible prevention of regenerative braking due to full charging during downhill rolling is avoided and a fuel economy for a hybrid vehicle is improved in total. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60L 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60L 11/14 (2006.01); B60K 6/20 (2007.10); B60K 6/445 (2007.10); B60K 6/48 (2007.10); B60L 11/18 (2006.01); B60L 15/20 (2006.01); B60W 10/08 (2006.01); B60W 10/26 (2006.01); B60W 20/00 (2006.01); B60K 1/02 (2006.01); F16H 3/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 20/13 (2016.01); B60K 1/02 (2013.01); B60K 6/445 (2013.01); B60K 6/48 (2013.01); B60L 11/123 (2013.01); B60L 11/14 (2013.01); B60L 11/1861 (2013.01); B60L 15/2045 (2013.01); B60W 10/06 (2013.01); B60W 10/08 (2013.01); B60W 10/26 (2013.01); B60W 20/12 (2016.01); B60L 2240/423 (2013.01); B60L 2240/443 (2013.01); B60L 2240/486 (2013.01); B60L 2240/62 (2013.01); B60L 2240/622 (2013.01); B60W 20/00 (2013.01); B60W 2550/13 (2013.01); B60W 2550/402 (2013.01); B60W 2710/105 (2013.01); F16H 3/725 (2013.01); F16H 3/727 (2013.01); F16H 2037/102 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6217 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6239 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6286 (2013.01); Y02T 10/645 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7005 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7044 (2013.01); Y02T 10/705 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7077 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7283 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7291 (2013.01); Y02T 90/16 (2013.01); Y02T 90/162 (2013.01); Y10S 903/903 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086848 A2 20010328; EP 1086848 A3 20020313; EP 1086848 B1 20050518; DE 60020198 D1 20050623; DE 60020198 T2 20060112; JP 2001095105 A 20010406; JP 3374802 B2 20030210; US 6507127 B1 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60020198

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020198 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI, LTD.

2005-05-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60L 15/20 A, 7B 60L 11/18 B, 7B 60K 6/04 B, 7B 60L 11/12 B, 7B 60L 7/12 B

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI