Global Patent Index - EP 1086870 A2

EP 1086870 A2 2001-03-28 - Traction-compression device for a drawbar

Title (en)

Traction-compression device for a drawbar

Title (de)

Zug-Druck-Kuppelstangeneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif du type traction-compression pour une barre d'attelage

Publication

EP 1086870 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250233 A

Priority

DE 19944754 A

Abstract (en)

The coupling rod device has a coupling rod (3) on the pressure receiving side of a support bearing (2), with a straightening link pressure plate (4) and a roll-off curve (5). There is a traction rod (6) forming the end part of the coupling rod, which may be able to move along in the support bearing. The traction rod passes through the support bearing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Zug - Druck - Kuppelstangeneinrichtung für Schienenfahrzeuge mit allseitiger Richtgelenkwirkung, bei der der Wirkungsgrad des Richtgelenkes verbessert wird und Zuglängskräfte im Zugverband gering gehalten werden. Die Kuppelstange (3) besitzt an ihrer Endfläche ein Zugstangenteil, welches im Mittelpunkt einer Richtgelenkdruckplatte (4) sitzt. Die Richtgelenkdruckplatte (4) ist fest oder axial - längs- verschiebbar mit dem Zugstangenteil verbunden. Die Zugstange (6) ist durch eine Stützplatte, die starr mit dem Untergestell verbunden ist, hindurch geführt und erhält darin eine spezielle Lagerung. Im Mittelpunkt der Abrollkalotte besitzt die Kuppelstange (3) ein spezifisch geformtes Zentrierstumpfteil (10), welches in einem Zentriertrichter (11), der in einen Öffnungstrichter übergeht, aufgenommen wird. An der Zugseite des Stützlagers ist ein Kugelgelenkansatz vorgesehen, der mit der Kontur der folgenden Zugscheibe korrespondiert. Die nachfolgende Feder (13) für die Aufnahme von Zugkräften sorgt für eine spielfreie Verspannung der Lagerstellen und für den erforderlichen Dämpfungseffekt aus der Zugbewegung im Zugverband. Es werden auch Ausführungen vorgeschlagen, bei denen an der Zugaufnahmeseite des Stützlagers und / oder an der Druckaufnahmeseite Federelemente angeordnet sind. Dabei können unmittelbare Dämpfungen in Druck- und Zugrichtung direkt erzielt werden, deren Anordnung im wesentlichen in Abhängigkeit der zu bestreitenden Wagengewichts - Lastgruppen entschieden werden kann. Die Erfindung sichert, daß leichtgewichtige Güterwagen die internationalen Forderungen der Laufsicherheit, insbesondere der Entgleisungssicherheit erfüllen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 9/00 (2006.01); B61G 9/04 (2006.01); B61G 9/06 (2006.01); B61G 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086870 A2 20010328; EP 1086870 A3 20010912; EP 1086870 B1 20040929; AT 277798 T 20041015; CZ 20003131 A3 20010516; CZ 294052 B6 20040915; DE 19944754 A1 20010329; DE 19944754 B4 20040129; PL 342529 A1 20010326; SK 13602000 A3 20010611

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050713

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-11-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDIN

2004-11-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BARTEL, MANFRED

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020205

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI