Global Patent Index - EP 1086889 A2

EP 1086889 A2 2001-03-28 - Stabilizer fin

Title (en)

Stabilizer fin

Title (de)

Stabilisationsflosse

Title (fr)

Ailette de stabilisation

Publication

EP 1086889 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120138 A

Priority

IT TV990102 A

Abstract (en)

A stabilizer fin, comprising a tapering body (2) with a symmetrical profile, characterized in that one or more wedge- or ramp-shaped elements (8) are provided on the lateral surface or surfaces of said body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/24 (2006.01); B63H 25/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/248 (2013.01); B63H 25/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086889 A2 20010328; EP 1086889 A3 20020529; IT 1311861 B1 20020319; IT TV990102 A1 20010323

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 1/24 A, 7B 63B 39/06 B

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI