Global patent index - EP 1086894 A2

EP 1086894 A2 2001-03-28 - Machine for packaging by means of a plastic sleeve with an improved system to put on a load said sleeve

Title (en)

Machine for packaging by means of a plastic sleeve with an improved system to put on a load said sleeve

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verpacken mittels einer Kunststoffhülse mit verbessertem System zum Anbringen dieser Hülse auf einer Ladung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour emballer avec un manchon plastique ayant un système amélioré pour appliquer ce manchon sur une charge

Publication

EP 1086894 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120740 A

Priority

IT MI991977 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1086893A2] The present invention relates to a combined hooding apparatus for packaging by means of a plastic sleeve of the type comprising a support frame on which there is provided: a system for forming a hood of heat-shrinkable plastic material obtainable from a tubular material folded in pleated fashion; a system for supplying said hood to a delivery point arranged at the top of said support frame; a device for fitting said hood, apt to pick up the hood from said system for supplying and fit it onto a load to be wrapped; and an annular structure which is movable vertically on said frame and on which there is fixed a circle group of burners inside which heating of said heat-shrinkable hood is performed, wherein said annular structure is suspended from a top section of said support frame by means of first raising means and is pivotably mounted on a support bracket displaceable vertically on a column of said support frame by means of second raising means, said annular structure being able to be stowed down by pivoting about an axis of rotation of said support bracket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01); B65B 53/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01); B65B 53/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086894 A2 20010328; EP 1086894 A3 20020619; AT 296753 T 20050615; DE 60020468 D1 20050707; DE 60020468 T2 20060629; DK 1086893 T3 20051003; EP 1086893 A2 20010328; EP 1086893 A3 20020619; EP 1086893 B1 20050601; ES 2244380 T3 20051216; IT 1313378 B1 20020723; IT MI991977 A1 20010323; IT MI991977 D0 19990923; PT 1086893 E 20051031

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65B 9/13 A, 7B 65B 53/06 B

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI