Global Patent Index - EP 1086905 A2

EP 1086905 A2 2001-03-28 - Packaging container

Title (en)

Packaging container

Title (de)

Verpackungsbehältnis

Title (fr)

Récipient d'emballage

Publication

EP 1086905 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118027 A

Priority

DE 19945446 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging unit takes the form of a hose which is closed along its opposite end edges (11) incorporating folded back sections (13, 15) so that the two main surfaces (19, 23) of the unit are joined to one another by side surfaces (21, 25). The length of each of the folded back sections (13, 15) is less than half the length of the edge (11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verpackungsbehältnis in der Form eines Schlauches, der an seinen beiden Enden (11) jeweils entlang einer Endkante geschlossen ist, so daß zwei Hauptflächen des Verpackungsbehältnisses gebildet sind, die sich jeweils zwischen den beiden Endkanten erstrecken. Der Schlauch ist an seinen beiden Endkanten jeweils von einer ersten Seite und einer der ersten Seite gegenüberliegenden zweiten Seite in einem ersten Einschlagabschnitt (13) bzw. einem zweiten Einschlagabschnitt (15) eingeschlagen, so daß zwischen den beiden Hauptflächen eine erste endseitig eingeschlagene Seitenfläche und eine zweite endseitig eingeschlagene Seitenfläche gebildet ist. Die Länge des ersten und zweiten Einschlagabschnitts beträgt jeweils weniger als die Hälfte der Länge einer Endkante. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086905 A2 20010328; EP 1086905 A3 20020703; DE 19945446 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI