Global Patent Index - EP 1086906 A3

EP 1086906 A3 2002-09-25 - Package for a cylindrical stack of round biscuits

Title (en)

Package for a cylindrical stack of round biscuits

Title (de)

Verpackung für einen rohrförmigen Stapel von runden Keksen

Title (fr)

Emballage pour pile cylindrique de biscuits ronds

Publication

EP 1086906 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00120831 A

Priority

IT MI992005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1086906A2] A package for a plurality of substantially round biscuits arranged one over another into a cylindrical stack which is enveloped in a wrapper formed with a slit (6) for issuing/taking out biscuits therethrough, the slit being located a predetermined distance away from one of the wrapper ends (4,5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 3/26 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5844 (2013.01); B65D 3/262 (2013.01); B65D 75/5838 (2013.01); B65D 2575/586 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086906 A2 20010328; EP 1086906 A3 20020925; EP 1086906 B1 20050518; AT 295811 T 20050615; DE 60020199 D1 20050623; DE 60020199 T2 20060112; DK 1086906 T3 20050919; ES 2245288 T3 20060101; IT 1313633 B1 20020909; IT MI992005 A1 20010327; IT MI992005 D0 19990927; PT 1086906 E 20050930

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140926

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151026

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140926

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-05-26 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050402348

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 295811 T

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-05-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150325

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-04-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150325

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60020199

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130906

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245288 T3

2005-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-09-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050402348

2005-09-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050925

2005-09-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020199 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BARILLA G. E R. FRATELLI S.P.A.

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030324

- Countries: SI

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI