Global Patent Index - EP 1086909 A1

EP 1086909 A1 2001-03-28 - Hinge-lid box for cigarettes

Title (en)

Hinge-lid box for cigarettes

Title (de)

Klappschachtel für Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Boîte à couvercle articulé pour cigarettes

Publication

EP 1086909 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119948 A

Priority

DE 19945514 A

Abstract (en)

The flip-top pack for cigarettes has a collar (19) which fits into the base of the pack and over which the lid fits in the closed position. This has slits (26) near its top positioned at the corners where the side walls (21, 22) meet the front wall (20). The fold lines at the bottom of the collar have a rounded cross-section which increase its resilience.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Klappschachtel aus Schachtelteil (10) und Deckel (11) sowie einem im Schachtelteil (10) fixierten Kragen (19) geht es um eine präzise Positionierung des Kragens (19) unabhängig von der Form und Größe des Packungsinhalts. Zu diesem Zweck werden seitwärtsgerichtete Rückstellkräfte auf Kragen-Seitenlappen (21, 22) durch eine besondere Ausgestaltung von (aufrechten) Kragen-Faltkanten (23, 24) ausgeübt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10; B65D 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/6691 (2013.01); B65D 85/1045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086909 A1 20010328; EP 1086909 B1 20040728; DE 19945514 A1 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150914

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150914

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150914

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007185

2015-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140912

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140910

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007185 P 20040902

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI