Global Patent Index - EP 1086914 A1

EP 1086914 A1 2001-03-28 - Device for transporting flexible and flat products

Title (en)

Device for transporting flexible and flat products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Transport von flexiblen, flächigen Erzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transporter des produits flexibles et plats

Publication

EP 1086914 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115187 A

Priority

CH 175399 A

Abstract (en)

The transport device has a separation organ (40), at least one support element (3x,3y,3z) and at least one retaining element (4x,4y,4z) which are moved in respective paths (B1,B2) around a drive shaft (5), for reception of the topmost printed product (1) removed from a product stack (2) by the separation organ and forwarding to a delivery point.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung dient zum Transport von flexiblen, flächigen Erzeugnissen (1), insbesondere Druckereierzeugnissen, von einem an einer Aufnahmestelle positionierten Stapel (2) zu einer Abgabestelle. Die Vorrichtung weist ein Separierorgan (40) sowie ein Stützelement (3) und ein Halteorgan (4) auf, die, angetrieben von einer Welle (5), derart in einer ersten bzw. in einer zweiten Bahn (B1; B2) um die Welle (5) geführt sind, dass Erzeugnisse (1), die an den in Drehrichtung der Welle (5) entfernt liegenden Enden (11) mittels einer kraftschlüssigen Verbindung gehalten sind, an dem dazu gegenüberliegenden Ende (12) vom Separierorgan (40) einzeln erfasst und, mit der Oberseite (13) gegen die Welle (5) gewandt, in den Bereich der ersten Bahn (B1) angehoben werden können, wo sie durch das Stützelement (3) unterlaufen, mit der Unterseite (14) gegen die Welle (5) gewandt längs zur zweiten Bahn (B2) ausgerichtet und dort vom Halteorgan (4) an der Unterseite (14) erfasst, aus der kraftschlüssigen Verbindung gelöst, zur Abgabestelle befördert und dort an eine weitere Fördervorrichtung übergeben werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/42; B65H 3/08; B65H 3/32; B65H 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086914 A1 20010328; EP 1086914 B1 20030502; AT 238955 T 20030515; AU 5661900 A 20010329; AU 772888 B2 20040513; CA 2320499 A1 20010324; CA 2320499 C 20080617; DE 50001939 D1 20030605; DK 1086914 T3 20030825; ES 2192506 T3 20031016; JP 2001097581 A 20010410; JP 4674677 B2 20110420; US 6488274 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160714

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-02-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130714

2014-10-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130713

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130713

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130713

2014-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130713

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 238955 T

- Effective date: 20130713

2014-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1086914E

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192506 T3

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030713

2003-07-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030713

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001939 P 20030605

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI